judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. ADDIE KNIGHT, ET AL. v. RICHARDSON PETROLEUM COMPANY, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO AND REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY, RICHARDSON PETROLEUM COMPANY, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO, AND REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

Case: A-425
A-425
12/28/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. ADDIE KNIGHT, ET AL.
RICHARDSON PETROLEUM COMPANY, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO AND REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY, RICHARDSON PETROLEUM COMPANY, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO, AND REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/27/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/17/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/09/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/22/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/20/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/08/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
12/28/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/11/1957Letter Filed
06/27/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/17/1945Brief on the Merits
04/09/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/22/1945Brief on the Merits
03/20/1945Brief on the Merits
02/12/1945Order from Lower Court filed
02/12/1945Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/08/1945Response to Petition
12/28/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/28/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richardson Petroleum Company, First National Bank of Chicago, and Republic Supply CompanyRespondent
Richardson Petroleum CompanyRespondent
First National Bank of Chicago and Republic Supply CompanyRespondent
Mrs. Addie Knight, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information