Case: 13-13-00062-CR
13-13-00062-CR
01/30/2013
Tampering with Witness
JUAN JIMENEZ
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/03/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||||
03/03/2014 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||||
11/07/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
| ||||||
11/07/2013 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/19/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
08/18/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
08/18/2016 | Record checked out | | |||||||
11/12/2014 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
11/10/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
07/31/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
07/30/2014 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/09/2014 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
07/09/2014 | Motion for leave disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||||
07/09/2014 | Motion disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||||
03/03/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
03/03/2014 | Brief received - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
03/03/2014 | Motion for leave filed | | |||||||
03/03/2014 | Motion filed | | |||||||
02/24/2014 | Record checked in | | |||||||
02/21/2014 | Record checked in | | |||||||
02/21/2014 | Record checked out | | |||||||
01/03/2014 | Motion for leave disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||||
12/16/2013 | Certification of word count compliance filed | | |||||||
12/16/2013 | Record checked out | | |||||||
12/04/2013 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
11/07/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
11/07/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
11/07/2013 | Motion for leave filed | | |||||||
11/07/2013 | Brief received - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
11/07/2013 | Record checked in | | |||||||
10/25/2013 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
09/30/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||||
09/24/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
09/11/2013 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
08/30/2013 | Fax received | | |||||||
08/21/2013 | Notice of late brief | | |||||||
06/13/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
06/12/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
05/15/2013 | Record checked out | | |||||||
05/10/2013 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
05/10/2013 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
03/25/2013 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
03/25/2013 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
03/06/2013 | Document filed | | |||||||
02/28/2013 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
02/28/2013 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
02/28/2013 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
02/20/2013 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
02/11/2013 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
01/30/2013 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||||
01/30/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/10/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/10/2039 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Adolfo Aguilo Jr. Hon. Mark Skurka |
Jimenez, Juan | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Coretta T. Graham |
Trial Court Information
214th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Jose Longoria
12-CR-1411-F (S1)
2 yrs TDCJ, $399 Ct Costs