judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEEGAN (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 35811/39442

Case Information: 38129
Short Caption:MEEGAN (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 35811/39442Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35811 *, 38129, 39442 Related Case(s): 29511 , 29739 , 32191 , 35811 , 37277 , 38054 , 38360 , 39442 , 40983 , 46028 , 47610 , 48152 , 48173 , 49373 , 50288 , 57447
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135497Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/19/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11362
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38114/38115/38129-cases are not consolidated. 01-12547
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 28, 2001, appellant filed a notice of appeal from the June 6, 2001 order that was docketed in this court in Docket No. 38129. On August 17, 2001, appellant filed a second notice of appeal from the June 6, 2001 order that was docketed in this court in Docket No. 38360. Thus, two separate cases were inadvertently opened in this court under Docket Nos. 38129 and 38360. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 38360. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 38129 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 38360. Appellant's appeal from the denial of his motion will proceed under Docket No. 38129. This order does not affect the portion of this court's July 24, 2001 order filed in Docket No. 38129 directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the trial court record within one hundred and twenty days. Nos. 38129/38360-these cases are not consolidated. 01-16329
09/27/2001Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. 08/22/01 Filed Certified Copy of proper person Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (01-14248).
11/19/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 22. 01-19378
11/19/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order of Reversal and Remand (No. 35811), Order of Affirmance (No. 38129), and Order Denying Petition (No. 39442). Pursuant to NRAP 3(b) we have elected to consolidate these matters for disposition. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court in Docket No. 38129 AFFIRMED.' fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB. Nos. 35811/38129/39442. 02-17381
11/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-17424
11/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 7, 2002. 02-17424