judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: G. PAUL HOWES

Case Information: 10-BG-0938
Short Caption:IN RE: G. PAUL HOWESClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN131-02Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/04/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Elizabeth A. HermanYY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentG. Paul Howes N
Paul L. Knight YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. a three year suspension. The Board does not recommend a fitness requirement, as proposed by Bar Counsel.
08/02/2010RECEIVED errata sheet correcting an error in the Separate Statement of Mr. Frank as to Sanction.
08/10/2010ORDER On consideration of the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility filed with the Court on July 27, 2010, and the Errata sheet received by the Court on August 2, 2010, correcting an error in the separate statement of Theodore D. Frank, Esquire, as to sanction, it is ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why the Court should not enter an order of suspension pending final action on the Board on Professional Responsibility's recommendation. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
08/16/2010RESPONDENT'S EXCEPTIONS
08/16/2010PETITIONER'S EXCEPTIONS (Bar Counsel)
08/24/2010LETTER from the Board on Professional Responsibility advising the court that the Board will not seek leave to file a brief to address Bar Counsel's exceptions.
08/25/2010ORDER On consideration of the exceptions of respondent and Bar Counsel, filed in response to the Board on Professional Responsibility's report and recommendation filed on July 27, 2010, and the letter from the Board on Professional Responsibility (the Board) advising the Court that the Board will not seek leave to file a brief to address Bar Counssel's exception, it is ORDERED that the brief of respondent (an original and three copies) shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of Bar Counsel shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (JAC)
09/09/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
09/17/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to respondent's response to show cause order
09/20/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC (RESPONDENT'S) - ROTSC (BAR COUNSEL) - respondent's motion to exceed page limit - opening brief
09/23/2010RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to exceed page limits of principal brief. (unopposed)
09/30/2010ORDER On consideration of the Board on Professional Responsibility's report and recommendation, this court's order directing respondent to show cause why he should not be suspended pending final action on the Board's report, the responses of respondent and Bar Counsel and respondent's motion to exceed the page limit of the principal brief, it is ORDERED that respondent is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia effective immediately and pending further order of this court. See D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 9 (g)(e)(a). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's motion to exceed the page limitation is denied. (RD,TH,NW)
10/04/2010RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to reset the commencement date of suspension.
10/04/2010RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
10/05/2010PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to respondent's motion to reset the commencement date of suspension,
10/12/2010AFFIDAVIT of respondent (Sec 14 (g))
10/13/2010TMC - respondent's motion to reset commencement of suspension - oppo
10/19/2010ORDER On consideration of respondent's motion to reset commencement of his suspension, the opposition thereto and it appearing that respondent filed his D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) affidavit on October 12, 2010, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion to reset commencement of his suspension is denied as moot. (RD,TH,NW)
11/03/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF (Bar Counsel)
11/04/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/04/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
11/09/2010 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of January 2011 through March 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by NOV. 22, 2010, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
11/12/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING Elizabeth Herman, Esquire, Deputy Bar Counsel.
11/23/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING Paul L. Knight, Esquire (Attorney for Respondent)
11/24/2010RESPONDENT'S REPLY BRIEF
12/16/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel requesting that the court take judicial notice of the Superior Court opinion and order in Gaither, following the remand from the DCCA. See Christopher v. Aguigui, 841 A.2d 310, 315 n.2 (D.C. 2003)
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/14/2011RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to extend oral argument time.
02/16/2011PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to respondent's motion to extend oral argument time.
02/25/2011On consideration of respondent's motion for additional argument time, and Bar Counsel's response thereto, and it appearing that this matter is scheduled on the Regular Calendar of March 8, 2011, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this matter that the motion is denied. (JC)
03/03/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (Bar Counsel)
03/08/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/08/2011FiledARGUED before Reid,Blackburne-Rigsby,Pryor. Elizabeth A.Herman Esq.for petitioner. Paul L.Knight Esq.,for respondent.
03/08/2012FiledDisbarment - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, it is ORDERED that respondent G. Paul Howes is disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, effective thirty days from the date of this opinion. (BR,PY,RD)
03/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File apetition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. (unopposed) (Respondent)
03/21/2012FiledMotion to reset effective date of disbarment. (Respondent)
03/27/2012FiledAnswer/Response of Bar Counsel to respondent's motion to reset effective date of disbarment. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
03/28/2012FiledOrder - ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and respondent's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed on or before April 6, 2012.
06/07/2012FiledOrder - ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the effective date of respondent's disbarment is nunc pro tunc to September 30, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that an amended opinion shall issue on the date of this order (BR,PR,RD)
06/07/2012FiledOrder - Amended Opinion issued this date. (BR,PR,RD)
08/23/2012FiledOrder Denying the petition for rehearing en banc, (WS,GL,**FI,*BR,TH,OB,BK,**EA,***ML,*PY,*RD,****RZ) **Associate Judge Fisher and Easterly have recused. ***Associate Judge McLeese III did not participate in this matter. ****Senior Judge Ruiz was an Associate Judge, Retired of the court at the time of argument. Her status changed to Senior Judge on July 2, 2012.
12/24/2012FiledReceived a copy of an order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit ordering respondent's name to be removed from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice in this court effective 35 days from the date of this order unless the court receives pr that date a response from Mr. Howes showing cause why his right to practice before this court should not be terminated. (Respondent)