Case: D-2089
D-2089
02/18/1992
App Writ of Error
LAW OFFICES OF MARVIN B. ZIMMERMAN & ASSOCIATES P.C. MARVIN B. ZIMMERMAN and GAIL ZIMMERMAN
GEORGE L. WILLIAMS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/21/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
02/18/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/13/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Rehearing Filed | | |
03/11/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
02/28/1992 | Petitioner's reply brief | | | |
02/27/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
02/21/1992 | Reply to Response | | | |
02/18/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
02/18/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply - $5.00 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/13/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
LAW OFFICES/ MARVIN ZIMMERMAN | Petitioner | Mr. John M. Pinckney III |
ZIMMERMAN, GAIL | Petitioner | Ms. Judith Reed Blakeway |
WILLIAMS, GEORGE L. | Respondent | Mr. Royal B. Lea III Mr. Joel H. Pullen |
ZIMMERMAN, MARVIN B. | Petitioner | Ms. Judith Reed Blakeway |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-90-00551-CV
Rev/aff/part,as modified
RULE 90, 11-06-91
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable SHIRLEY W. BUTTS
Trial Court Information
224th District Court
Bexar
87-CI-15561