judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER VS. JONES

Case Information: 38130
Short Caption:MILLER VS. JONESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29391 , 38445
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A295490Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11368
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bourgnault & Harding Law Office--check no. 8267.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 10, 2001. 01-12486
07/23/2001Other Other. Returned, with letter, original cost bond to district court clerk. (Received with filing fee and case appeal statement.)
07/25/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
08/20/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Not on form provided (missing sections) and late. Motion for an extension to file late requested in notice. Due date: 10 days. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
08/28/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14536
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 28, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received August 28, 2001. 01-14991
09/05/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14538
09/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
09/26/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Accept Late Filing of Transcript Request Form. 01-16224
10/17/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 26, 2001. The clerk shall file the transcript request form received on September 26, 2001. Because this appeal is currently in settlement conference, court reporter Janie L. Olsen shall suspend the preparation of transcripts pending the resolution of the settlement conference and further order of this court. 01-17525
10/17/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 30, 2001 through May 29, 2001. To Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. 01-16225
02/15/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-03058
02/20/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-03280
02/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-03642
02/27/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.