judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRAD LEE BEHNKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-45)
Case Number:06-45Case Docketed On:03/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:BRAD LEE BEHNKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRAD LEE BEHNKE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrad Lee BehnkeKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/21/2006Order - Convert to petitionOrderConvert to petitionFinal
04/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/08/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/24/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/25/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/22/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with faxed copy of waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/24/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/24/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal - original signatureNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal