Case: 06-10-00237-CR
06-10-00237-CR
12/30/2010
Assault
Deontra Terrel Mason
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/01/2011 | Anders brief filed | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
09/13/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/13/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/12/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
08/22/2011 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
08/22/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/01/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Ordered carried with the case | | ||||
07/01/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
07/01/2011 | Anders brief filed | | |||||
06/02/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/02/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/28/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
04/04/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
12/30/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/24/2012 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
11/10/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mason, Deontra Terrel | Appellant | |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Richard Glaser |
Mason, Deontra Terrell | Appellant | |
Mason, Deontra Terrel | Appellant | Deontra Terrel Mason |
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Laurine Blake
CR-10-23444
1 YRS COUNTY JAIL