judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00291-CR
13-89-00291-CR
07/27/1989
Forgery
Sterling, William E.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Letter sent
12/31/1990Mandate Issued
12/18/1990Record checked in
11/21/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/25/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
09/20/1990Cite for opinions
09/20/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
09/06/1990Petition for Review
08/29/1990Petition for Dis. Review - Additional Copies
08/28/1990Petition for Review
08/24/1990XPetition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/1990XPetition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/1990XPetition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Notice not to argue
03/15/1990Submitted
03/15/1990Submission
03/06/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
02/21/1990Submission
02/05/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990Sworn Statement filed
01/09/1990Brief Filed
01/09/1990Case ready to be set
01/09/1990Appellant's Brief Received
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Motion for leave to file Sup. SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/14/1989Motion for leave to file supp. statement of facts
12/14/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
12/14/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
12/14/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
11/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/10/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/10/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/23/1989Letter sent
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
Honorable Whayland W Kilgore
88-4-3679
10 yrs tdc