judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00845-CR
01-89-00845-CR
08/17/1989
Other Felony
Law, Brady
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/17/1991Date final opinion release for publication
07/13/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/28/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/13/1991Opinion issuedReversed and rendered (acquittal)
06/13/1991Opinion issuedReversed and rendered (acquittal)
11/01/1990Submitted
11/01/1990Submission
11/01/1990Submitted
09/07/1990Submission
03/29/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
03/05/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/10/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/18/1989Statement of facts filed
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/17/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/11/1989Brief due for retained counsel
08/29/1989Transcript filed
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1989Notice of appeal filed
07/07/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames. L. Turner
StateCriminal - AppellantBuddy Stevens
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
19,100
10 yrs probation