judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00877-CV
05-89-00877-CV
07/27/1989
Mandamus
William E. Baird, Relator
Frances A. Harris, Respondent
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/2017Order enteredDestroy
06/16/2017Letter issued by the court
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
09/13/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
09/13/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
09/03/1989Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
08/21/1989Submitted
08/21/1989Submission
08/21/1989Submitted
08/07/1989Response to Motion
07/27/1989Motion for Leave to File
07/27/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
302nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frances Ann Harris
88-12239-U