judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MATTHEW LEFANDE V. CAROLYN MISCHE-HOEGES

Case Information: 11-FM-0010
Short Caption:MATTHEW LEFANDE V. CAROLYN MISCHE-HOEGESClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO2080-10Filed Date:01/03/2011

Opening Event Date:01/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:09/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMatthew LefandeNPro SeN
AppelleeCarolyn Mische-Hoeges N
Stephen L. Neal, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/14/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 3, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
01/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 6/22/10 7/6/10 7/7/10 7/29/10 8/30/10 9/20/10 9/21/10 (rt. needed)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 6/22/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (9 pgs/tape) 7/6/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (6 pgs/tape) 7/7/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (16 pgs/tape) 7/29/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (23 pgs/tape) 8/30/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (16 pgs/tape) 9/20/10 proc.
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (4 pgs/tape) 9/21/10 proc. w/cd
02/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for (filing a) non-procedural motion - Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal
03/02/2011RECEIVED - Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal with exhibits (4 cys) in support of motion
03/03/2011TMC - motion to file (LODGED) motion TO STAY IN EXCESS PAGES
03/14/2011RECEIVED - aple's response to aplt's motion to stay order pending appeal
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY- in support of motion to stay order pending appeal
03/18/2011On considertion of appellant's motin for leave to exceed the page limit, the lodged motion to saty, the oppostion thereto, and it appearing that the record is complete, it is O that the motion to exceed pages is granted and the lodged m for stay filed FO that the motion for stay is denied. SEE ORDER (RDKRTE)
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
03/18/2011FO that appellant's brief and appendix shall be filed in 40 days, the brieef of appellee 30 days thereafter. Appellant is reminded of the page resitrictions SEE ORDER (RDKRTE)
04/07/2011APPEARANCE of Stephen L. Neal, Jr. as co-counsel for Appellee.
04/11/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS aple *(Ryan M. Witkowksi) Granted
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE Joint Appendix and briefs. no oppo
04/22/2011ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and the appearance of Ryan M. Witkowski, Esq., is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is F/O that the Clerk shall note that Stephen L. Neal, Esq., is the new counsel of record for appellee. (ETW)
04/28/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief and joint appendix
05/10/2011ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's lodged brief and the joint appendix are filed. It is F/O that appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 27, 2011. (JAC)
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX (joint)
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days after the court rules on aple's motion to dismiss appeal
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL or in the alternative to strike aplt's brief and joint appdx
05/12/2011TMC - motion to dismiss OR strike appellant's brief - appellee's motion to extend briefing - oppoS - appellee's motion to file supp brief/appdx - (LODGED) brief/appdx - oppo to motion to file supp brief
05/20/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief and opposition to to motion to dismiss appeal
05/25/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to file supplemental appendix opposed
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to motion to file supp appdx.
05/31/2011MEMORANDUM- from aple memo in support of aple's motion to dismiss appeal or, in th aalternative, to strike aple's brief and the joint appendix
06/02/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY - to memorandum in support of her opposed motion to file supp appdx.
09/06/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE
09/06/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR LEAVE AND CLERK SHALL FILE SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND REPLY BRIEF
09/06/2011Filedaple's brief
09/06/2011FiledSupplemental Appendix (Appellee)
09/06/2011Filedaplt's reply brief
09/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/20/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledLetter To appellant returning his petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc since the case is still pending before the court. Appellant to be notified as soon as the case is calendared.
10/12/2011LodgedLetter From appellant again wanting to file his pro se petition for rehearing or reheairng en banc (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledLetter To appellant again returning his pro se petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From - attorney Stephen L. Neal, Jr.
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/19/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Granted
12/23/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion to dismiss (Appellant)
12/28/2011FiledAnswer/Response in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (Appellee)
12/29/2011FiledTMC//MOTION TO DISMISS//OPPO//REPLY
01/09/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
01/09/2012FiledDismissed
01/20/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/23/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc
03/02/2012FiledMandate