judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEE (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34926
Short Caption:LEE (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154040Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09532
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10279
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11322
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 1999. 99-11322