Case Heading (S-11-0052) | |||||
Case Number: | S-11-0052 | Case Docketed On: | 03/01/2011 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | GLORIA LYNN LANDEROZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | GLORIA LYNN LANDEROZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Gloria Lynn Landeroz | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Cathleen D. Parker |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2011 WY 168 |
Citation: | 267 P.3d 1075 (Wyo. 2011) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/01/2011 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/01/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/01/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/18/2011 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
04/19/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/19/2011 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/01/2011 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/05/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/20/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/26/2011 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential File | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/30/2011 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
09/01/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen Parker for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/01/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/28/2011 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
10/28/2011 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
12/28/2011 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with remand, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
12/30/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for by agent for Warden at Wyoming Women's Center 12/29/2011. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
01/13/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
01/13/2012 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
01/13/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
01/13/2012 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/18/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - mandate signed for by agent of Warden at Wyoming Women's Center. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
01/20/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/18/2012. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |