judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00367-CV
04-89-00367-CV
07/27/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Roger S. Castillo; Lydia Castillo; Ronald Cope&Herlinda Cope
Samuel T. May & Silvia May
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/1990Mandate Issued
12/13/1990Mandate Issued
10/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/21/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/21/1990Brief Filed
09/05/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/04/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/22/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
08/22/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
03/08/1990Submission
02/28/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Case ready to be set
02/28/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Response to Motion Filed
02/09/1990Show cause hearing held
01/26/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/28/1989Requests Oral Argument
12/28/1989Brief Filed
12/28/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
12/18/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989No Description Available.
12/08/1989No Description Available.
12/06/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedDismissed
11/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedDismissed
11/20/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Requests Oral Argument
11/16/1989No Description Available.
11/16/1989No Description Available.
11/09/1989Information regarding cause received
11/08/1989No Description Available.
11/08/1989No Description Available.
11/06/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/06/1989No Description Available.
10/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/29/1989Information regarding cause received
09/25/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/1989Certificate of Service Filed
08/04/1989Verification Filed
08/02/1989Information regarding cause received
07/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/31/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
218th Judicial District Court
Atascosa
Honorable Robert L. Eschenburg, II
-SEE BELOW-
n/a