judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00189-CV
09-89-00189-CV
07/27/1989
Divorce
Humble, Carolyn Ellen
Humble, John Duncan
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1991Mandate Issued
09/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/18/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1991Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
05/08/1991Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
04/23/1991Petition for Writ
03/21/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/18/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/14/1991Memorandum to Clerk
03/14/1991Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1991Miscellaneous Motions
03/07/1991Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1991Mt for ext time to file Mt for Rehearing Filed
02/14/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/20/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
11/20/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
11/15/1990Supplemental Brief Received
10/25/1990Submitted
10/25/1990Submission
08/02/1990Submission
03/13/1990Brief Filed
03/13/1990Case ready to be set
02/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989Brief Filed
11/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/02/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/27/1989Transcript Filed
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carolyn Ellen HumbleAppellantPamela E. George
John Duncan HumbleAppelleeMichael Petit
Trial Court Information
279th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Robert Paul Walker
F-135,700