judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00197-CR
02-89-00197-CR
07/27/1989
All Misdemeanors
Lee, Jerry Don
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/17/1990Mandate Issued
08/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Submission
05/15/1990Order Entered
03/30/1990Brief Filed
03/02/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/05/1990Submission
02/05/1990Brief Filed
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/03/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989No Description Available.
08/18/1989No Description Available.
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
0309040
$350 fine, 90 days jail-