judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00186-CV
12-89-00186-CV
07/27/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Tom Thumb Stores, Inc.
Koonce, Mary Georgette
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
11/10/1992
11/05/1992Mandate Issued
11/05/1992No Description Available.
10/20/1992Record returned.
09/09/1992No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
07/13/1992No Description Available.
07/13/1992Filing Fee Paid
07/08/1992Filing Fee Paid
07/08/1992No Description Available.
06/12/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/12/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/12/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/12/1992Order Entered
02/14/1992motion for rehearing filed
02/13/1992Response to Motion Filed
02/10/1992motion for rehearing filed
01/31/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/31/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/17/1991Submitted
01/17/1991Submission
12/18/1990Submission
10/23/1989
10/12/1989Brief Filed
10/12/1989Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Motion for Leave to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/18/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/18/1989Brief Filed
09/12/1989supplemental transcript filed
09/12/1989Supplemental Transcript Received
08/17/1989
08/10/1989Motion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
07/31/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/29/1989Surety Bond Filed
05/02/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
04/06/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tom Thumb StoresAppellantMs. Joann N. Wilkins
Koonce, Mary GeorgetteAppelleeMr. Dan Stroup
Trial Court Information
124th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
88-853-B
$58,100 + 10% int.