judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM L. SPENCER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0009
Short Caption:WILLIAM L. SPENCER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD8462-06Filed Date:01/06/2011

Opening Event Date:01/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/2012
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam L. Spencer NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter S. SmithYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 6, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COPIES
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/08/2011ORDERED: That this appeal is hereby dismissed. ASee D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/08/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
03/30/2011WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
06/17/2011MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE - and requesting appointment under CJA to represent aplt (Filed by attorney Hinkes)
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Recall Mandate, reinstating appeal, appointing counsel and directing briefing
07/26/2011FiledMandate Recalled
07/26/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Jaonne Vasco, Esquire (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw - and substitute counsel with Enid Hinkes (Appellant)Granted
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to withdraw as counsel and directing briefing order
09/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/28/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Enid Hinkes, Esquire (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until January 17, 2012
01/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/17/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ferren, Washington
09/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
10/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/18/2012FiledMandate