judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DYLAN J. RAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0051)
Case Number:S-11-0051Case Docketed On:02/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DYLAN J. RAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DYLAN J. RAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDylan J. RayDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/08/2011Order - Other - Clarifying Scope of AppealOrderOtherFinal
04/18/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/20/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
04/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/21/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal