judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00891-CR
05-89-00891-CR
07/27/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Hernandez, Manuel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2000Record RetentionDestroy
10/02/1989Mandate Issued
10/02/1989Motion to Expedite MandateMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
10/02/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
10/02/1989Mandate Issued
10/02/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
08/16/1989Transcript Filed
07/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/27/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/19/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/1989Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
203rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Thomas Thorpe
F89-76558-P
4 yrs TDC