judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00224-CV
12-89-00224-CV
09/13/1989
Mandamus
Spurs, Clarence, Relator
Tunnell, Hon. Joe, Judge, 241st District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/26/1989
10/11/1989
09/26/1989No Description Available.Otherwise Disposed
09/26/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/26/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Submission
09/26/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Exhibits received
09/13/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/13/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
86-1128