judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ-VALENCIA (JORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38309
Short Caption:CHAVEZ-VALENCIA (JORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45958
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001732Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13763
08/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14343
08/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 18, 2001 and June 19, 2001. To Court Reporter: D. Davidson and S. Thomas. 01-14344
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 18, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 01-15493
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 19, 2001. Court Reporter: Susan E. Thomas. 01-15494
12/14/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 10, 2002. 01-21058
01/14/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/10/02. 02-00887
01/14/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-00888
01/30/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01/28/02. Signed by: Gary Hatlestad, Deputy District Attorney. 02-01975
02/22/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 02/21/02. Signed by: John Reese Petty. 02-03383
02/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-03531
02/26/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/28/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP01-CY/DA/ML 02-05542
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05740
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/02/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. 02-05740