judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN A. DELOGE v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0072)
Case Number:S-11-0072Case Docketed On:03/29/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STEVEN A. DELOGE v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:STEVEN A. DELOGE, Appellant (Petitioner/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven A. DeLogeVaughn Howard Neubauer
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 154
Citation:264 P.3d 28

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/29/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Docketing delayed by withdrawal of counsel and appointment of new counsel)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/29/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/10/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II; Agency Record (Redacted and Unredacted).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/1/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/05/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Appellant requesting docket page. SentCorrespondenceIncomingFinal