judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00854-CR
14-89-00854-CR
09/13/1989
Assault & battery
Rodriguez, Miguel Donjuan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/1990Case stored
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAMOOT
04/19/1990Mandate Issued
04/19/1990Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/19/1990Mandate Issued
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/30/1990Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
03/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/01/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/27/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/29/1989Exhibits FILED
11/24/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/24/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
11/24/1989Order Entered
11/24/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/17/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
11/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/13/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
11/07/1989No description available.
09/13/1989Transcript FILED
09/13/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/05/1989Date of Sentence
09/05/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Henry C. Paine, Jr.
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
18,770-272
10 years/$5,000 fine