judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHEPARD (GARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38308
Short Caption:SHEPARD (GARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45481 , 68699 , 72089 , 72089-COA , 79478 , 79478-COA , 81700
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000833Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13760
08/13/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 11, 12, 13, 14 and 15, 2001. To Court Reporter: D. Davidson. 01-13761
08/14/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 11, 2001, June 11, 2001 (volume 1), June 12, 2001, June 13, 2001, June 13, 2001 (volume 3), June 14, 2001 and June 15, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 01-13871
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14413
12/17/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 11, 2002. 01-21152
01/14/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/11/02. 02-00893
01/14/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. 02-00895
02/04/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/01/02. Signed by: Gary H. Hatlestad. 02-02237
03/01/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 2/28/02. Signed by Cheryl D. Bond. 02-03806
07/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-11550
07/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15657
10/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15826
10/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2002. 02-15826