judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DERRICK DONTE PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0029
Short Caption:DERRICK DONTE PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-15135-09Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDerrick D. Phillips YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Erek Barron, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Erek Barron, Esquire
02/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (149 pgs/Maddox) 10/20-21/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (368 pgs/Maddox) 10/25-26/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8 pgs/Maddox) 10/28/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (16 pgs/tape) 1/6/11 proc. w/cd
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED pleadings)
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/02/2011APPENDIX
07/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
07/13/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/31/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/31/2011FiledAffirmed
11/21/2011FiledMandate
12/07/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/21/2011LodgedMotion For Extension Of Time to File Panel Rehearing (Appellant)
12/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's pro se petition for rehearing on or before January 23, 2012
02/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing for 15 days. (Appellant)
02/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc on or before February 16, 2012.
02/23/2012FiledMotion To Stay Pending Appeal, or in the Alternative to Issue an Injunction. *****CONSTRUED AS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME(Appellant)
03/21/2012FiledOrder Granting MOET to the EXTENT THAT APPELLANT MAY FILE A MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE NO LATER THAN MAY 14, 2012