judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01099-CR
05-89-01099-CR
09/13/1989
Robbery
Sowels, Larry Gene
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/2020Order enteredDestroy
02/07/2006Record Returned
10/18/2005Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/2005Motion to Withdraw Record
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/19/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
09/20/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/01/1990Brief Filed
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/27/1989Brief Filed
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/13/1989Transcript Filed
10/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/13/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/14/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Verla S Holland
F89-83048-V
15 yrs TDC