judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00226-CV
02-89-00226-CV
09/13/1989
Mandamus
Parten, Katherine Jean Foltz
Brigham, Hon. William H., Judge, 233rd District Court
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/15/1990Case stored
12/29/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Letter Brief Filed
10/17/1989Letter Brief Filed
10/05/1989Submitted
10/05/1989Submission
09/29/1989Response Filed
09/22/1989Response Filed
09/19/1989Submission
09/19/1989Petition for Original Proceeding
09/19/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion to File
09/13/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/15/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Michael Schattman
233-111694