judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00298-CR
07-89-00298-CR
09/13/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
White, Jimmy Lee, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/1991Mandate Issued
05/08/1991Mandate Issued
04/08/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/12/1990Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Brief Filed
11/15/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.
11/14/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/24/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
10/20/1989Do not use
10/20/1989Do not use
10/18/1989Do not use
09/13/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/13/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
89-409,037
20 years TDC