judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00317-CV
13-89-00317-CV
08/17/1989
Injunction
Jamison, B. M. & Frances Jamison
The MECA Corporation
No
1st Court of Appeals
08/09/1988
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/1990Mandate Issued
05/01/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
03/29/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/22/1990Response to _____________.
03/15/1990Motion for rehearing filed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Submission
09/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/30/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/18/1989Submission
08/17/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/24/1989Supplemental transcript filed
05/24/1989Exhibits Filed
05/19/1989Brief Filed
05/19/1989Case ready to be set
04/27/1989Brief Filed
04/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/28/1989Motion to Amend the Record
03/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
01/12/1989Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
01/03/1989Filing Fee Paid
01/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/10/1988Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/31/1988Filing Fee Paid
09/08/1988Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/30/1988Due date for record to be filed
08/15/1988Filing Fee Paid
08/09/1988Transcript Filed
07/14/1988Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Raul L Longoria
82G0771