judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00396-CV
04-89-00396-CV
08/16/1989
Contract
CSC Construction Services, Inc.
Johns & Hausmann Design Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1990Mandate Issued
08/06/1990Mandate Issued
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1990Submitted
01/10/1990Submission
01/10/1990Submitted
01/02/1990Reply brief filed
12/08/1989Submission
10/09/1989Requests Oral Argument
10/09/1989Brief Filed
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
09/14/1989Brief Filed
09/14/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/12/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/02/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
87-CI-18563
n/a