judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00980-CR
05-89-00980-CR
08/16/1989
Other Drug Sale
Malone, Brett Channing
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/30/1991Mandate Issued
04/30/1991Mandate Issued
04/17/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/31/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
11/30/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/08/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/12/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
09/28/1990Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/20/1990Motion to Abate Filed
09/14/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/06/1990Letter Sent by the Court
08/02/1990Case ready to be set
08/02/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/02/1990Case ready to be set
07/16/1990Motion for Leave to File
06/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/02/1990Letter Sent by the Court
04/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/28/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/19/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989Brief Filed
10/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/01/1989Transcript Filed
08/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/16/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/30/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Richard Mays
F89-95335-TQ
Life, TDC