judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00330-CR
13-89-00330-CR
08/17/1989
Other Felony
Ishola, Wasin
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
10/12/1988
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/29/1989Mandate Issued
11/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/31/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/12/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Submission
09/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/18/1989Submission
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Brief Filed
07/17/1989Case ready to be set
06/20/1989Brief Filed
06/01/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/1989Statement of Facts Filed
03/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/18/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/30/1988Transcript Filed
10/12/1988Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
499,028
3 yrs tdc