judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00781-CR
14-89-00781-CR
08/17/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Satcherwhite, Jerry Dean
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1991Case stored
03/12/1991Mandate Issued
03/12/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/08/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
01/24/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/24/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/24/1990Submitted
10/24/1990Submission
10/24/1990Submitted
09/27/1990Submission
05/25/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
05/03/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/25/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/28/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/21/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/17/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/22/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/16/1989Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
11/16/1989No description available.
11/10/1989Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE
11/09/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/03/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
11/01/1989No description available.
10/27/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/27/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/26/1989Transcript FILED
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/15/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/11/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/30/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantLydia Clay-Jackson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasLester Blizzard
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM HATTEN
512,313
10 years TDC