judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES PHILLIP GRAHAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0053)
Case Number:S-11-0053Case Docketed On:03/01/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JAMES PHILLIP GRAHAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES PHILLIP GRAHAM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Phillip Graham Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Susan Gail O'Brien

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2011 WY 130
Citation:261 P.3d 239

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Modified to reflect filing of Appellant's Brief)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2011Brief - Appellant - Calculated due date from date of docketing (appendices not scanned - unredacted)BriefAppellantFinal
04/13/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of address for appellant.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
06/20/2011Service - Mail returned.ServiceMail returnedFinal
09/16/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal