judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00336-CR
13-89-00336-CR
08/17/1989
Felony DWI
Mikeska, Denise A.
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
10/28/1988
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/05/1990Letter sent
01/08/1990Mandate Issued
01/03/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
12/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
11/21/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/07/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Submission
09/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/18/1989Submission
08/17/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/12/1989Brief Filed
06/12/1989Case ready to be set
06/06/1989Brief Filed
05/17/1989Brief Filed
04/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
04/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/01/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/12/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/1989Statement of Facts Filed
12/30/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/22/1988Transcript Filed
10/28/1988Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable Joe Kegans
8824744
180 day prob 2 yrs 4000 fn