judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00324-CR
13-89-00324-CR
08/17/1989
Marijuana Possession
Gonzalez, Marcelino Garza
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
09/15/1988
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/1990Address Change
04/02/1990Cite for opinions
03/01/1990Mandate Issued
02/14/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/31/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Submission
09/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/18/1989Submission
08/17/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1989Brief Filed
05/18/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/18/1989Case ready to be set
05/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/09/1989Brief Filed
03/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/23/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/18/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/08/1988Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1988Statement of Facts Filed
11/23/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/19/1988Transcript Filed
09/15/1988Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/01/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable Michael T. Mcspadden
496,489
10 yrs tdc & 1000 fine