judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00325-CR
13-89-00325-CR
08/17/1989
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Burns, Richard Wayne
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
08/17/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1991Letter sent
10/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/08/1990Record returned to Court.
09/12/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
06/11/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
06/08/1990Appendix for the
06/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
06/01/1990Petition for Review
05/03/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/20/1990Motion for rehearing filed
04/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1989Letter sent to attorneys
09/26/1989Copy of Order from trial court.
09/07/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Submission
09/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/17/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
08/17/1989Submission
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Brief Filed
05/30/1989Case ready to be set
05/05/1989Brief Filed
05/04/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/24/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/23/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/09/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
01/24/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/05/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/22/1988Motion to Substitute Counsel
12/08/1988Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1988Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/21/1988Transcript Filed
09/28/1988Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Michael T. Mcspadden