judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00391-CV
04-89-00391-CV
08/16/1989
Summary Judgment
Stephen Wickersham
Joe Mike Egan, Jr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/1991Mandate Issued
01/11/1991Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/20/1990Submitted
03/20/1990Submission
03/20/1990Submitted
02/12/1990Submission
02/02/1990Reply brief filed
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Brief Filed
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
12/11/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/27/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/06/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
10/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
10/23/1989Order Entered
10/23/1989Order Entered
10/23/1989Order Entered
10/23/1989Order Entered
10/23/1989Order Entered
10/18/1989No Description Available.
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
10/03/1989Order Entered
09/15/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
09/15/1989Brief Filed
09/06/1989Response to Motion Filed
08/28/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/21/1989Show cause hearing held
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/14/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
216th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable Stephen B. Ables
89-63-A
n/a