judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-82-00382-CR
13-82-00382-CR
01/01/1981
Other Felony
Style1
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/1983Mandate Issued
10/06/1983Opinion issued
10/06/1983Opinion issued
10/06/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1983motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1983motion to file
09/18/1983Brief Filed
09/18/1983State's (Crim) Brief Received
06/09/1983Submission
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Marion M Lewis