judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-86-00499-CR
13-86-00499-CR
01/01/1981
Other Felony
Style1
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/29/1987Mandate Issued
07/29/1987Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/08/1987Miscellaneous Motion
06/04/1987Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/28/1987Mot. for leave to file motion for rehear DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1987Motion for leave to file motion for rehearing
05/18/1987ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
05/18/1987Motion for rehearing filed
05/18/1987Motion for rehearing
04/30/1987Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/02/1987Submitted
04/02/1987Submission
03/17/1987Submission
03/12/1987Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1987Certificate Filed
02/23/1987Motion for leave to file brief
02/18/1987Appellant's Brief Received
02/18/1987Brief Filed
02/18/1987Case ready to be set
02/10/1987Green card in
02/06/198710 day letter sent
01/21/1987Green card in
01/19/198710 day letter sent
12/16/1986Due date for record to be filed
12/12/1986Transcript Filed
10/27/1986Filing Fee Paid
10/20/1986Notice of Appeal Filed
10/20/1986Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/29/1987Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Joe B. Evins