judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-87-00450-CV
13-87-00450-CV
01/01/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Style1
STYLE2
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/29/1989Address Change
07/25/1989Mandate Issued
07/24/1989Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/28/1989Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
01/03/1989Cite for opinions
12/02/1988Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/18/1988Writ Filed
10/20/1988Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/20/1988Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/07/1988Response to _____________.
10/07/1988Response to _____________.
09/28/1988Motion for rehearing filed
09/28/1988Motion to Stay
09/15/1988Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/14/1988Submitted
04/14/1988Submission
03/22/1988ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
02/12/1988Submission
02/11/1988Motion for leave to file Sup. SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/1988Reply Brief Filed
01/27/1988Filing Fee Paid
01/27/1988Motion for leave to file supp. statement of facts
01/25/1988Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
01/25/1988Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
01/25/1988Supplemental statement of pages filed
01/18/1988Brief Filed
01/18/1988Oral argument requested
01/14/1988Motion for leave to file Sup. SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1988Sworn Statement filed
12/31/1987Brief Filed
12/31/1987Case ready to be set
12/31/1987Motion for leave to file supp. statement of facts
12/31/1987No oral argument requested
12/31/1987Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
12/31/1987Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
12/31/1987Supplemental statement of pages filed
12/02/1987Exhibits Filed
12/02/1987Statement of Facts Filed
12/02/1987Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/19/1987Address Change
11/12/1987Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/1987Due date for record to be filed
11/02/1987Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/02/1987Transcript Filed
11/02/1987Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Darrell Hester