judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-07080-CV
08-81-07080-CV
01/05/1981
Contract
Bob Gumm, dba Bob's Mobile Home Sales, et al.
Mortgageamerica Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/22/1982Mandate Issued
11/16/1982Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
05/24/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/21/1982Application for Writ of Error
04/28/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/14/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/31/1982Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
03/03/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
03/03/1982Mandate Issued
03/03/1982Submission
03/03/1982Submitted
03/03/1982Case ready to be set
07/30/1981Submitted
06/24/1981Submission
06/01/1981Brief Filed
05/06/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/01/1981Brief Filed
02/25/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/1981Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
02/11/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/04/1981Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/04/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/04/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/1981Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
01/15/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/15/1981No description available.
01/08/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/05/1981Record filed.
01/01/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
79-2157
n/a