judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-07079-CV
08-81-07079-CV
01/02/1981
Contract
Texas West Oil & Gas Corporation, et al.
El Paso Gas Transportation Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1990Fee paid
06/30/1982Mandate Issued
06/14/1982Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
04/14/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/08/1982Application for Writ of Error
04/08/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
02/24/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/05/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
02/05/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/01/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
01/01/1982Submission
01/01/1982Submitted
01/01/1982Case ready to be set
06/12/1981Submitted
04/29/1981Submission
03/06/1981Brief Filed
02/25/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/02/1981Brief Filed
01/02/1981Record filed.
01/01/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Reeves
10,832
n/a