judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-83-00055-CR
13-83-00055-CR
01/01/1981
Other Felony
Style1
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
11/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1983Submitted
09/13/1983Submission
05/03/1983Transcript Filed
02/22/1983Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Ronald Yeager
5866
2 yrs.