judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-00007-CR
05-81-00007-CR
01/03/1981
Carrying a Handgun
Arthur Franklin Harris
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/08/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedPro Se
02/04/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/04/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/2015Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/16/1983Letter filed
11/15/1982Letter issued by the court
11/10/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/08/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/03/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
02/28/1980Clerks record filed
02/04/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/04/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/04/1979Reporters record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/2015Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Harris, Arthur FranklinCriminal - Appellant
The State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 265th District Court
F-79-2254-PR
Life