judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DAVID E. DUTY AND WIFE v. GENERAL FINANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: A-4645
A-4645
04/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DAVID E. DUTY AND WIFE
GENERAL FINANCE COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
12/04/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/17/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/22/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/22/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/24/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/14/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
05/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/28/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
11/04/1955Miscellaneous letter
03/17/1955Order from Lower Court filed
12/04/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/22/1954Response to Motion filed
11/17/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/03/1954Opinion issued
06/22/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/22/1954Brief on the Merits
05/26/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/14/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
05/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1954Reply to Response
04/28/1954Response to Petition
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Irion, Cain, Bergman and CockeAmicus Curiae
General Finance Company, et al.Respondent
Coleman GayAmicus Curiae
State Junior Bar of TexasAmicus Curiae
McGown, Godfrey, Logan and DeckerAmicus Curiae
David E. Duty and wifePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information