judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALMAN (ALBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38323
Short Caption:SALMAN (ALBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0482Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice AgostiPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/07/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13921
10/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38323-DC# CR98P0482/38409-DC# C85W205/38477-DC# CR001612/38495-DC# C83P365. 01-17764
11/07/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 01-18593
11/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/13/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/23/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-WM/CY/ML 02-09071
06/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 23, 2002, this court entered an order of affirmance in this appeal. On June 18, 2002, appellant submitted a document entitled "Notice That This Court lacks Jurisdiction to Dismiss Petitioner's Post-Conviction Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus." In spite of its title, the document is a petition for rehearing. Because the petition was not submitted timely, the clerk of this court shall return the petition to appellant. The clerk shall issue the remittitur in this appeal. 02-10638
06/19/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Albert Richard Salman. Returned unfiled, the original "Notice That This Court lacks Jurisdiction to Dismiss Petitioner's Post-Conviction Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus" (petition for rehearing) received June 18, 2002.
06/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10661
06/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2002. 02-10661