judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRY MEDINA V. SECURIGUARD INCORPORATED

Case Information: 11-AA-0048
Short Caption:HARRY MEDINA V. SECURIGUARD INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01963-10Filed Date:01/20/2011

Opening Event Date:01/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHarry Medina NPro SeN
RespondentSecuriguard IncorporatedN
Scott D. Helsel YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/20/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nuncn pro tunc)
01/20/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by: DCCA)
02/10/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
02/18/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
02/24/2011 ORDERED that the lodged petition for review is filed nunc pro tunc to January 20, 2011. It is F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
02/24/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
03/09/2011RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to the identity of counsel. Attorney Scott D. Helsel will represent Securiguard Inc. on appeal
05/24/2011LETTER - from OAH to petitioner regarding transcript
06/06/2011RECEIVED - aplt's IFP form (Partial) (returned, petitioner paid the $100 fee)
06/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/supplemental (no transcripts)
06/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/22/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/22/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
06/27/2011RECEIVED - letter from OAH to petitioner pursuant to conversation with Holly Kirk re: waiver of transcripts
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record#1 ( hearing of 9/24/10)
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
07/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Farrell
02/01/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Harry Medina (Petitioner)
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/09/2012FiledMandate